Senate | 05/10/2023 | Referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Senate | 04/27/2023 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 04/27/2023 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 1362.) | ||
Assembly | 04/20/2023 | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. | ||
Assembly | 04/19/2023 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 19). | ||
Assembly | 03/22/2023 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (March 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 02/09/2023 | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. | ||
Assembly | 01/27/2023 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 26. | ||
Assembly | 01/26/2023 | Read first time. To print. |