|
09/29/2024
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 977, Statutes of 2024.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2024
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2024
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 21. Noes 14.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2024
|
Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 39. Noes 0.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 12.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/06/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/05/2024
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2024
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 4.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2024
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2024
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/21/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 55. Noes 8. Page 5355.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/08/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 1.) (May 8).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2024
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 2.) (April 17).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2024
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2024
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|