Assembly | 05/16/2024 | In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Assembly | 05/08/2024 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 04/29/2024 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 04/25/2024 | Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 04/24/2024 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 23). | ||
Assembly | 04/17/2024 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P. | ||
Assembly | 03/11/2024 | Referred to Coms. on AGING & L.T.C. and P. & C.P. | ||
Assembly | 02/17/2024 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. | ||
Assembly | 02/16/2024 | Read first time. To print. |