|
10/13/2023
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 801, Statutes of 2023.
|
|
|
|
10/13/2023
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/19/2023
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/12/2023
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/12/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2685.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2023
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/05/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (September 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/14/2023
|
In committee: Referred to APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/11/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on M. & V.A. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on M. & V.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2023
|
Referred to Coms. on ED. and M. & V.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2023
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 1969.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 18).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/10/2023
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2023
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/27/2023
|
Re-referred to Com. on M. & V.A.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/23/2023
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/22/2023
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on M. & V.A. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (March 21).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/09/2023
|
Referred to Coms. on HIGHER ED. and M. & V.A.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/31/2023
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 2.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/30/2023
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|