California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB3221 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2024

Enrolled

Bill August 28, 2024

Chaptered

Bill September 27, 2024

Amended

Bill August 5, 2024
Bill June 17, 2024
Bill April 1, 2024