California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB3234 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2024

Enrolled

Bill August 28, 2024

Chaptered

Bill September 22, 2024

Amended

Bill August 14, 2024
Bill August 6, 2024
Bill May 28, 2024
Bill April 1, 2024