California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB3255 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2024

Enrolled

Bill September 5, 2024

Chaptered

Bill September 25, 2024

Amended

Bill August 15, 2024
Bill June 25, 2024
Bill April 24, 2024