06/14/2024 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 19, Statutes of 2024. | |||
06/14/2024 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
06/13/2024 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m. | |||
Assembly | 06/06/2024 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 4355.). | ||
Senate | 05/30/2024 | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. | ||
Senate | 05/29/2024 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 29). | ||
Senate | 05/01/2024 | Referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Senate | 04/15/2024 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 04/15/2024 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 4784.) | ||
Assembly | 04/11/2024 | From Consent Calendar by request of Assembly Member Essayli. To Third Reading. | ||
Assembly | 04/08/2024 | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. | ||
Assembly | 04/04/2024 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 3). | ||
Assembly | 02/17/2024 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. | ||
Assembly | 02/16/2024 | Read first time. To print. |