California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB3265 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2024

Enrolled

Bill August 31, 2024

Chaptered

Bill September 14, 2024

Amended

Bill August 22, 2024
Bill June 20, 2024
Bill April 9, 2024