|
09/28/2024
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 854, Statutes of 2024.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2024
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/05/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2024
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2024
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2024
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 28 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2024
|
Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2024
|
From inactive file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2024
|
Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Blakespear.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2024
|
From Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 18).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
Referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2024
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5087.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 24).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/21/2024
|
Referred to Com. on ELECTIONS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/14/2024
|
From printer. May be heard in committee April 13.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/13/2024
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|