07/15/2024 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 123, Statutes of 2024. | |||
07/15/2024 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
07/01/2024 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |||
Assembly | 06/26/2024 | Enrolled measure version corrected. | ||
Assembly | 06/20/2024 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 06/20/2024 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4624.). | ||
Senate | 06/13/2024 | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. | ||
Senate | 06/12/2024 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 12). | ||
Senate | 05/08/2024 | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | ||
Senate | 04/29/2024 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 04/29/2024 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 5034.) | ||
Assembly | 04/23/2024 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 22). | ||
Assembly | 03/20/2024 | From printer. May be heard in committee April 19. | ||
Assembly | 03/19/2024 | Read first time. To print. |