|
10/07/2023
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 315, Statutes of 2023.
|
|
|
|
10/07/2023
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/20/2023
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/13/2023
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 62. Noes 16. Page 3348.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/12/2023
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/12/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 6. Page 2637.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/07/2023
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/06/2023
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/06/2023
|
Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2401.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/06/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 7. Page 2401.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (September 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2023
|
In committee: Referred to APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/14/2023
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/26/2023
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/13/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (July 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2023
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 20).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/12/2023
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2023
|
Referred to Coms. on E. & C.A. and GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 61. Noes 15. Page 1702.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (May 18).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/10/2023
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2023
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/27/2023
|
Re-referred to Com. on ELECTIONS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/23/2023
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ELECTIONS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/23/2023
|
Referred to Coms. on ELECTIONS and L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
12/06/2022
|
From printer. May be heard in committee January 5.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
12/05/2022
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|