California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB342 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 31, 2023

Enrolled

Bill September 11, 2023

Chaptered

Bill September 22, 2023

Amended

Bill August 17, 2023
Bill June 7, 2023
Bill May 23, 2023
Bill March 29, 2023
Bill March 21, 2023