California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB349 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 31, 2023

Enrolled

Bill September 11, 2023

Chaptered

Bill October 7, 2023

Amended

Bill June 19, 2023
Bill May 9, 2023