California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB356 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 31, 2023

Enrolled

Bill July 14, 2023

Chaptered

Bill July 27, 2023

Amended

Bill April 18, 2023
Bill March 7, 2023