California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB361 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 1, 2023

Enrolled

Bill September 11, 2023

Chaptered

Bill October 8, 2023

Amended

Bill June 20, 2023
Bill May 2, 2023
Bill March 9, 2023