Senate
|
06/19/2023
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2023
|
Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2023
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 2003.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 18).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/10/2023
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/12/2023
|
Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/11/2023
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/14/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (March 13). Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2023
|
Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/02/2023
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 4.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/01/2023
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|