Senate
|
08/30/2024
|
Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Gonzalez.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2024
|
Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2024
|
From inactive file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/12/2023
|
Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Limón.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2023
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2023
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2023
|
From Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2023
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2023
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2023
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 1972.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 18).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2023
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/22/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (March 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/16/2023
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/15/2023
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/06/2023
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/02/2023
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 4.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/01/2023
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|