Assembly
|
09/20/2024
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/12/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2024
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2024
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/23/2024
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2024
|
Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2024
|
From inactive file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2023
|
Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Ashby.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2023
|
From special consent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2023
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2023
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (September 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/14/2023
|
In committee: Referred to APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/12/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/05/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L., P.E. & R. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2023
|
Referred to Coms. on HUMAN S. and L., P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2023
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 2000.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2023
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (May 18).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2023
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1580.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/17/2023
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/03/2023
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/27/2023
|
Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/23/2023
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/23/2023
|
Referred to Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/02/2023
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 4.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/01/2023
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|