Assembly
|
01/29/2024
|
Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/03/2024
|
Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
10/08/2023
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/20/2023
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/13/2023
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 3468.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/13/2023
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/13/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 3. Page 2701.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2023
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/14/2023
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/10/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/06/2023
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 5).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2023
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2023
|
Referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 1588.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 26).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/29/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/26/2023
|
Referred to Com. on ELECTIONS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
12/09/2022
|
Introduced measure version corrected.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
12/06/2022
|
From printer. May be heard in committee January 5.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
12/05/2022
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|