Senate
|
09/01/2023
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/14/2023
|
In committee: Referred to APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2023
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 2.) (June 27).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 65. Noes 5. Page 1788.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2023
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 3.) (May 18).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2023
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/30/2023
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/29/2023
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2023
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 2.) (March 28).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/26/2023
|
Referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
12/06/2022
|
From printer. May be heard in committee January 5.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
12/05/2022
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|