|
10/08/2023
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 434, Statutes of 2023.
|
|
|
|
10/08/2023
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/21/2023
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/14/2023
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 3574.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/13/2023
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/13/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2765.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2023
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/05/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2023
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (September 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/10/2023
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2023
|
Referred to Com. on PUB S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2023
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1984.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (May 18).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2023
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/14/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/09/2023
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/03/2023
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 5.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/02/2023
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|