LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB397
Action History
CA
California Assembly Bill AB397
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2023-2024 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB397
Action History
Assembly
01/09/2024
From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Assembly
01/08/2024
In committee: Set, second hearing. Failed passage.
Assembly
03/14/2023
In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
Assembly
02/09/2023
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
Assembly
02/03/2023
From printer. May be heard in committee March 5.
Assembly
02/02/2023
Read first time. To print.