California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB4 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 5, 2022

Amended

Bill August 6, 2024
Bill July 13, 2023
Bill June 27, 2023
Bill June 20, 2023
Bill March 9, 2023