Assembly
|
01/25/2024
|
Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/03/2024
|
Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
10/08/2023
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/20/2023
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/13/2023
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3442.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/12/2023
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/12/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2686.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2023
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/05/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (September 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/14/2023
|
In committee: Referred to APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/05/2023
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2023
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/23/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 889.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/16/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/15/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (March 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/14/2023
|
Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/13/2023
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/09/2023
|
Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/03/2023
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 5.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/02/2023
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|