California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB41 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 5, 2022

Enrolled

Bill September 12, 2023

Amended

Bill September 1, 2023
Bill July 13, 2023
Bill June 29, 2023
Bill June 21, 2023
Bill May 18, 2023
Bill April 26, 2023
Bill April 7, 2023
Bill March 14, 2023