|
07/06/2023
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 36, Statutes of 2023.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2023
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/03/2023
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2023
|
Enrolled measure version corrected.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/22/2023
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2023
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1682.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 13).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2023
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1274.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/13/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/12/2023
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/03/2023
|
Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/30/2023
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/16/2023
|
Referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/03/2023
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 5.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/02/2023
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|