Assembly | 02/01/2024 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Assembly | 01/31/2024 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | ||
Assembly | 01/18/2024 | In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Assembly | 01/18/2024 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 04/19/2023 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 04/12/2023 | Re-referred to Com. on C. & C. | ||
Assembly | 04/11/2023 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on C. & C. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/14/2023 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on C. & C. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 13). Re-referred to Com. on C. & C. | ||
Assembly | 02/09/2023 | Referred to Coms. on E.M. and C. & C. | ||
Assembly | 02/03/2023 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 5. | ||
Assembly | 02/02/2023 | Read first time. To print. |