|
10/10/2023
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 653, Statutes of 2023.
|
|
|
|
10/10/2023
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/13/2023
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/07/2023
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/07/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2482.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2023
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/30/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 65. Noes 0. Page 1008.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/23/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/22/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (March 22).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/09/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 21. Noes 0.) (March 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/09/2023
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/03/2023
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 5.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/02/2023
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|