|
10/08/2023
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 437, Statutes of 2023.
|
|
|
|
10/08/2023
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/13/2023
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/07/2023
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3019.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2023
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 7 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/05/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2351.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2023
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2023
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2023
|
From Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 7).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/30/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 65. Noes 0. Page 1011.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/23/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 22).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/23/2023
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/03/2023
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 5.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/02/2023
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|