California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB434 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 6, 2023

Enrolled

Bill September 18, 2023

Chaptered

Bill October 11, 2023

Amended

Bill September 8, 2023
Bill July 12, 2023
Bill March 16, 2023