California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB44 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 5, 2022

Enrolled

Bill September 18, 2023

Chaptered

Bill October 10, 2023

Amended

Bill September 1, 2023
Bill July 13, 2023
Bill June 14, 2023
Bill March 29, 2023
Bill March 2, 2023