Senate
|
09/01/2023
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2023
|
In committee: Referred to APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2023
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 21).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 1804.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2023
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (May 18).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/03/2023
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2023
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred to Com. on M. & V.A.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/07/2023
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 9.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/06/2023
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|