California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB447 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 6, 2023

Enrolled

Bill September 18, 2023

Chaptered

Bill October 10, 2023

Amended

Bill June 12, 2023
Bill May 18, 2023
Bill March 14, 2023