Assembly
|
01/30/2024
|
Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/03/2024
|
Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
10/08/2023
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/20/2023
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/13/2023
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 3383.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/12/2023
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/12/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2646.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2023
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (September 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/14/2023
|
In committee: Referred to APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/13/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/12/2023
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 11).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/05/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2023
|
Referred to Coms. on HUMAN S. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2023
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 1981.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 18).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/10/2023
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/03/2023
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (March 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/22/2023
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/21/2023
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/14/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (March 14). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/14/2023
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2023
|
Referred to Coms. on HUM. S. and JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/07/2023
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 9.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/06/2023
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|