Senate
|
08/15/2024
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2024
|
In committee: Referred to suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2024
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 29).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2024
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/29/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 3948.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/23/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/22/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/18/2024
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (January 18).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2023
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2023
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/22/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (March 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2023
|
Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/07/2023
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 9.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/06/2023
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|