Senate
|
08/15/2024
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/14/2023
|
In committee: Referred to APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/13/2023
|
Measure version as amended on July 12 corrected.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/12/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/11/2023
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 10).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on M. & V.A. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on M. & V.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2023
|
Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and M. & V.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1703.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 18).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2023
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1580.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/17/2023
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (May 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/14/2023
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to REV. & TAX. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/07/2023
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/26/2023
|
Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
12/06/2022
|
From printer. May be heard in committee January 5.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
12/05/2022
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|