|
10/07/2023
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 330, Statutes of 2023.
|
|
|
|
10/07/2023
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/12/2023
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2023
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/05/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2354.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2023
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & E. D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 1363.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 19).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (March 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2023
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/14/2023
|
Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/13/2023
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2023
|
Referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/07/2023
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 9.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/06/2023
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|