LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB487
Action History
CA
California Assembly Bill AB487
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2023-2024 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB487
Action History
Assembly
02/01/2024
From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Assembly
01/31/2024
Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
Assembly
02/17/2023
Referred to Com. on U. & E.
Assembly
02/08/2023
From printer. May be heard in committee March 10.
Assembly
02/07/2023
Read first time. To print.