Senate | 06/14/2023 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | ||
Senate | 06/01/2023 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 05/31/2023 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 64. Noes 16. Page 1985.) | ||
Assembly | 05/18/2023 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 05/18/2023 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (May 18). | ||
Assembly | 05/18/2023 | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1580.) | ||
Assembly | 05/17/2023 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 05/03/2023 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Assembly | 04/19/2023 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 04/19/2023 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 03/27/2023 | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | ||
Assembly | 03/23/2023 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 02/08/2023 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 10. | ||
Assembly | 02/07/2023 | Read first time. To print. |