|
10/08/2023
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 441, Statutes of 2023.
|
|
|
|
10/08/2023
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/13/2023
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/06/2023
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/06/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2387.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 7).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/23/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 62. Noes 0. Page 823.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/15/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/15/2023
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/09/2023
|
Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/08/2023
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2023
|
Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/08/2023
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 10.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/07/2023
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|