06/29/2023 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 15, Statutes of 2023. | |||
06/29/2023 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
06/23/2023 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |||
Assembly | 06/15/2023 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 06/15/2023 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1574.). | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. | ||
Senate | 06/07/2023 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 7). | ||
Senate | 05/10/2023 | Referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Senate | 04/27/2023 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 04/27/2023 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 1363.) | ||
Assembly | 04/19/2023 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 19). | ||
Assembly | 03/23/2023 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 02/08/2023 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 10. | ||
Assembly | 02/07/2023 | Read first time. To print. |