|
09/08/2023
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 164, Statutes of 2023.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2023
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2023
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:15 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2023
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2182.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2023
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 19).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on B., P. & E. D. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E. D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Referred to Coms. on JUD. and B., P. & E. D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2023
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/10/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 68. Noes 0. Page 1076.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/23/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/22/2023
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (March 21).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2023
|
Referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/08/2023
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 10.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/07/2023
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|