Assembly | 02/01/2024 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Assembly | 01/31/2024 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | ||
Assembly | 05/18/2023 | In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Assembly | 03/29/2023 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 03/21/2023 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 03/20/2023 | Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/16/2023 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (March 14). | ||
Assembly | 02/17/2023 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | ||
Assembly | 02/08/2023 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 10. | ||
Assembly | 02/07/2023 | Read first time. To print. |