|
09/28/2024
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 910, Statutes of 2024.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2024
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/12/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2024
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 55. Noes 4.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2024
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (August 28).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2024
|
Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2024
|
From inactive file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2024
|
Joint Rules 61 and 62 suspended. (Ayes 30. Noes 8.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/13/2023
|
Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Durazo.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2023
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (September 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/14/2023
|
In committee: Referred to APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2023
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2023
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2023
|
Referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2023
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 64. Noes 0. Page 2051.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 1.) (May 18).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2023
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/12/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/05/2023
|
Re-referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/04/2023
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2023
|
Referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/08/2023
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 10.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/07/2023
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|