LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB53
Action History
CA
California Assembly Bill AB53
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2023-2024 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB53
Action History
Assembly
02/01/2024
From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Assembly
01/31/2024
Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
Assembly
03/30/2023
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
Assembly
12/06/2022
From printer. May be heard in committee January 5.
Assembly
12/05/2022
Read first time. To print.