Assembly | 02/01/2024 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Assembly | 01/31/2024 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | ||
Assembly | 05/18/2023 | In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Assembly | 04/19/2023 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 03/16/2023 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (March 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 03/16/2023 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 01/26/2023 | Referred to Com. on AGRI. | ||
Assembly | 12/06/2022 | From printer. May be heard in committee January 5. | ||
Assembly | 12/05/2022 | Read first time. To print. |