California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB541 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 8, 2023

Enrolled

Bill September 18, 2023

Chaptered

Bill October 8, 2023

Amended

Bill September 8, 2023
Bill June 8, 2023
Bill May 30, 2023