|
10/11/2023
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 744, Statutes of 2023.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2023
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/19/2023
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/12/2023
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 59. Noes 16. Page 3234.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/12/2023
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 3228.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2023
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 13 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 9. Page 2558.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/05/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2023
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (September 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2023
|
In committee: Referred to APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2023
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (June 20).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2023
|
Referred to Com. on HOUSING.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2023
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 57. Noes 17. Page 2055.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 3.) (May 18).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2023
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2023
|
Measure version as amended on April 13 corrected.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/17/2023
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/13/2023
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/12/2023
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 12).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2023
|
Referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/09/2023
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 11.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/08/2023
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|