|
10/08/2023
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 512, Statutes of 2023.
|
|
|
|
10/08/2023
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/20/2023
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/13/2023
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/13/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2700.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2023
|
Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2023
|
From inactive file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2023
|
Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Ochoa Bogh.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2023
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Referred to Com. on PUB S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/08/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 1481.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2023
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1461.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/22/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (March 22).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/14/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (February 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/14/2023
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/13/2023
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/09/2023
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/26/2023
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
12/06/2022
|
From printer. May be heard in committee January 5.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
12/05/2022
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|